+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On October 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 1:45 P.M. 8/7/26 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 8/30 CH 45 SLA 24
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/28/24
On May 12, 2024 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 118(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 N1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 118(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRONK, SCHRAGE, GALVIN, TOMASZEWSKI, SUMNER, BAKER, MCCABE,
- ARMSTRONG, STAPP, WRIGHT
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- FIN RPT 9DP
- DP: GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, COULOMBE, CRONK, TOMASZEWSKI, ORTIZ, D.JOHNSON,
- FOSTER
- FN1: (DNR)
- FN3: (CED)
On April 29, 2024 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL REMOVED
On April 26, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES, FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 118(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER, BISHOP, STEDMAN, WILSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 118(FIN)
On April 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2024
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CAL
On April 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, WILSON, MERRICK, BISHOP
- NR: KIEHL
- FN1: (DNR)
- FN3: (CED)
On March 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, KAWASAKI
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- RES RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, KAUFMAN, DUNBAR
- NR: CLAMAN, WIELECHOWSKI
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN1: (DNR)
- FN2: (CED)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
- COSPONSOR(S): DUNBAR
On March 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN, MYERS
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
+ − Sponsors (12)
MERRICK
Type:
Primary Sponsor