+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- NR: PORTER, GREEN
- DP: ROKEBERG; DNP: CROFT, BERKOWITZ;
- JUD RPT 1DP 2DNP 2NR
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- WITHDRAW FROM CMTE FLD Y2 N37 E1
On May 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- CALENDAR 5/10/97
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N8 E1
On May 10, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
On May 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 114(JUD) AM
- RTN TO 2ND TO RESCIND ACTION UNAN CON
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RESCINDED ACTION ADPTG AM 1 Y10 N9 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N10 E1
- FAILED PASSAGE Y10 N9 E1
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO RLS COMMITTEE
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
On May 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (LABOR)
- FIN RPT 4NR (JUD)CS
- NR: SHARP, PHILLIPS, PARNELL, TORGERSON
- PREVIOUS FNS (LAW, ADM-2)
- RULES TO SUPP CAL 1 & 1NR 5/8/97
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N7 E1 A1
- THIRD READING 5/9 CALENDAR
On April 23, 1997 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FNS APPLY TO CS (ADM-2)
On April 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (LAW)
On April 1, 1997 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
- ZERO FN TO SB (LABOR)
- FNS TO SB (ADM-2, LAW)
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER; NR: PEARCE
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
JUDICIARY
Type:
Primary Sponsor