+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (59)
On July 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- 11:28 AM 5/3/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 20 SLA 10
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF 7/1/10
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/14/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 110(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, LYNN, GARA, KAWASAKI, JOHNSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 110(FIN)
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 6DP 5NR
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 25
- DP: GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER
- NR: THOMAS, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, SALMON, N.FOSTER
- FN4: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: ZERO(H.FIN/LAW)
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NT 6DP
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 25
- DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, HERRON, HOLMES, GATTO, RAMRAS
- FN4: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN6: (LAW)
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 110(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): WAGONER, DYSON, ELLIS, PASKVAN, MENARD, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, MEYER,
- MCGUIRE, HUGGINS, STEDMAN, THOMAS, STEVENS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 110(FIN)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
- NR: HUGGINS, OLSON
- FN4: ZERO(S.FIN/DPS)
- FN5: ZERO(DPS)
- FN6: (LAW)
On April 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- DP: FRENCH
- NR: THERRIAULT, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(DPS)
- FN2: (DPS)
- FN3: (LAW)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor