+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 47 SLA 98
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/20/98
On May 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- 10:30 AM 5/5/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On April 30, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 110(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 N2 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 24, 1998 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 6DP 3NR 1AM
- DP: MULDER, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, MOSES,
- KELLY, FOSTER; NR: THERRIAULT, MARTIN,
- DAVIS; AM: KOHRING
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 1/21/98
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 4NR
- DP: HUDSON, ROKEBERG; NR: COWDERY,
- SANDERS, BRICE, RYAN
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 1/21/98
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MULDER
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- LABOR & COMMERCE, FINANCE
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/22/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 110(L&C)
- PASSED Y16 N3 A1
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On January 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT (L&C)CS 2DP 2NR
- DP: SHARP, DONLEY
- NR: PHILLIPS, TORGERSON
- FN TO CS (DCED)
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, TAYLOR
On April 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
- DP: KELLY, MACKIE; NR: LEMAN
- FISCAL NOTE TO SB & CS (DCED)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- L&C, FIN