+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (64)
On July 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 6/9/98
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/8 CHAPTER 77 SLA 98
On May 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- 10:40 AM 5/15/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N3
- KELLY, ELLIS, SHARP, PEARCE, DUNCAN
- COSPONSOR(S): DONLEY, WILKEN, TAYLOR,
On May 12, 1998 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 11(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y40
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT, RYAN, BERKOWITZ
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N26 A1
- KUBINA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 10, 1998 in the House:
- OGAN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MASEK, KOTT, DYSON,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CALENDAR
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 9, 1998 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- KOHRING; NR: MARTIN
- GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, DAVIS, KELLY,
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP 1NR
On April 18, 1998 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KEMPLEN
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- WITHDRAW FROM CMTE Y12 N27 A1
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- HES RPT HCS(HES) 4DP 1NR 1AM
- INDETERMINATE FISCAL NOTE (DOE)
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, BUNDE, KEMPLEN
- NR: PORTER; AM: BRICE
On May 8, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On May 7, 1997 in the House:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADPTD Y16 N3 E1
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N7 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY Y14 N5 E1
- LINCOLN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADPTD Y17 N2 E1
- PASSED Y12 N7 E1
- TITLE AM 1 ADOPTED Y10 N8 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 11(FIN)
On May 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/97
- INDETERMINATE FN (DOE)
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y14 N5 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- THIRD READING 5/6 CALENDAR
On May 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- SHARP, ADAMS; AM: PARNELL, DONLEY
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS; NR: PEARCE,
- FIN RPT CS 2DP 3NR 2AM NEW TITLE
On April 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE TO CS (DOE)
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE TO SB (DOE)
- DP:WILKEN, GREEN, WARD; NR:ELLIS, LEMAN
- HES RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On January 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor