+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (81)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- VETOED BY GOVERNOR 8/28/14
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- FN5: (CRT)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
- 2:30 PM 8/7 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 108(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 20, 2014 in the House:
- FN6: ZERO(DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
- IN FINANCE
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 2DNP 5NR
- DP: THOMPSON, T.WILSON, MUNOZ, GARA
- DNP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES
- NR: NEUMAN, EDGMON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN5: (CRT)
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FN7: ZERO(LAW)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y39 A1
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 108(FIN)
- ENGROSSED
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/20/2014
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, KELLER
- PASSED Y23 N16 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 108(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N30 A3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- IN FINANCE
- RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On April 13, 2014 in the House:
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
- DP: LEDOUX, LYNN, KELLER
- NR: PRUITT, GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN5: (CRT)
- FN6: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 108(JUD)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N17 E1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, MEYER,
- DUNLEAVY, STEVENS, KELLY, ELLIS, FAIRCLOUGH
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 108(JUD)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/28 CALENDAR
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN6: ZERO(DHS)
- FN5: (CRT)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 3NR
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- NR: COGHILL
- JUD RPT CS 1DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE
- DP: DYSON
- FN4: ZERO(CRT)
- AM: WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor