+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/20/18
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/22 CHAPTER 88 SLA 18
- 10:00 AM 8/16/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- VERSION: SB 107
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y36 N2 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 107
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/3 - ON 5/4 CALENDAR
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(H.FIN)
- NR: WILSON, PRUITT, TILTON
- DP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 7DP 3NR
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 107
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 107
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2017
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.FIN)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
SENATE FINANCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor