+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/14
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 71 SLA 14
On April 19, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 106(STA)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y36 E1 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(STA)
- JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, COSTELLO
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GATTIS, ISAACSON, KELLER
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(STA)
- VERSION: CSSB 106(STA)
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, DUNLEAVY, KELLY, DYSON, BISHOP, GIESSEL,
- STEDMAN, EGAN, HUGGINS, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 3/21 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: DYSON, GIESSEL
- STA RPT CS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor