+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 4/30 CH 27 SLA 20
- 10:15 A.M. 4/13/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 106(L&C)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On March 25, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(L&C)
- PASSED Y35 N2 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2020
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- DP: GILLIS, HANNAN, STORY, FIELDS, RASMUSSEN, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ
- L&C RPT 7DP
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019
- VERSION: CSSB 106(L&C)
- L&C CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 106(L&C)
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REINBOLD, KIEHL
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On May 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: REINBOLD, BIRCH, COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON
- L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- SHOWER, OLSON
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BISHOP, MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, GRAY-JACKSON, WILSON,
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor