+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (81)
On June 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 42 SLA 06
On May 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 8:49 AM 5/23/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CC RPT ADPTD Y18 N2 CCS SB 104
- CC REPORT TAKEN UP
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- FISCAL INFO FORTHCOMING
- FN4: ZERO(LAW)
- CC REPORT: CCS SB 104
- CC REPORT READ AND HELD
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- CC RPT ADPTD Y37 N1 A2 CCS SB 104
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- GUESS REPLACED FRENCH
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM N35 E1 A4
- MCGUIRE, LYNN, GRUENBERG
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- SENATE MESSAGE RE CC APPOINTMENTS
On May 10, 2005 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- SEEKINS (CHAIR), THERRIAULT, FRENCH
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y9 N10 E1
On May 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On May 7, 2005 in the House:
- PASSED Y39 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TITLE CHANGE: PENDING HCR 15
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N28 A2
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 104(JUD)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2005
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SAMUELS, GARDNER, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 104(JUD)
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELKINS, KERTTULA
- FN3: ZERO(REV) RECEIVED
On May 2, 2005 in the House:
- NR: DAHLSTROM, COGHILL
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NT 4DP 2NR
- DP: KOTT, GRUENBERG, GARA, MCGUIRE;
- FN(S) FORTHCOMING
- TITLE CHANGE: PENDING HCR
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ANDERSON, GARA, MCGUIRE
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: GARDNER
- DP: LYNN, ELKINS, GRUENBERG, SEATON;
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, OLSON, STEVENS G, GREEN, FRENCH, HUGGINS, DYSON, STEVENS B
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB104(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/7/2005
- VERSION: CSSB 104(JUD)
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- NR: FRENCH, GUESS
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, BUNDE, WILKEN, STEDMAN, COWDERY, GUESS, ELTON,
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- KOOKESH, WAGONER
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: THERRIAULT, ELTON, HUGGINS, DAVIS
- STA RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On February 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor