+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 104(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, MCGUIRE,
- BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, HUGGINS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 104(FIN)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 2DP 4NR NEW TITLE
- DP: MEYER, DUNLEAVY
- NR: KELLY, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN6: ZERO(ADM)
- FN7: (S.FIN/COR)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN6: ZERO(ADM)
- FN5: ZERO(REV)
- FN4: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN1: (REV)
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- STA RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor