+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/20
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/12 CHAPTER 1 SLA 20
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2:58 P.M. 3/9/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP, STORY, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON
- VERSION: SB 101
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y37 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 101
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: VANCE, HOPKINS, SHAW, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS
- STA RPT 6DP
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, LINCOLN, TARR
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 101
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2020
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, HUGHES, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WILSON, SHOWER
- PASSED Y16 N- E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 101
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: COGHILL, WILSON, KAWASAKI
- STA RPT 3DP
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- KIEHL, BIRCH, COGHILL, GRAY-JACKSON
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BISHOP, MICCICHE, STEVENS, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI,
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor