+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2012
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 100(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DAVIS, THOMAS, STEDMAN, ELLIS, KOOKESH, OLSON, WAGONER,
- STEVENS
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 100(FIN)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- FN2: (ADM)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: (ADM)
- NR: GIESSEL
- DP: EGAN, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD
- L&C RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS