+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
- AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On March 6, 2023 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2023
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: SB 10 AM H
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y38 N1 E1
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RUFFRIDGE, STAPP, CRONK, PATKOTAK, MEARS, GALVIN, JOSEPHSON,
- TOMASZEWSKI, MCCORMICK, WRIGHT, RAUSCHER, STUTES, VANCE, TILTON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 10 AM H
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- DP: MEARS, ARMSTRONG, DIBERT, MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, PATKOTAK, RAUSCHER, MCKAY
- RES RPT 9DP
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCCABE
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SUMNER, HANNAN
- RES
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 10
- VERSION: SB 10
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/15/23
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, GRAY-JACKSON, SHOWER
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- DP:BISHOP, GIESSEL, DUNBAR, KAUFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, CLAMAN
- RES RPT 6DP
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- MERRICK, CLAMAN, BISHOP, STEVENS
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, TOBIN, HUGHES, DUNBAR, BJORKMAN
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y38 N1 E1
+ − Sponsors (18)
KIEHL
Type:
Primary Sponsor