+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1:30 P.M. 6/20/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 8 SLA 19
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/27/19
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- FIN RPT 10DP
- DP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON,
- SULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ, WILSON
- FN2: (H.FIN/DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 10
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 10
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JACKSON, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, HOPKINS, LEBON, RASMUSSEN, LEDOUX,
- ZULKOSKY, MERRICK, FIELDS, DRUMMOND, LINCOLN, SPOHNHOLZ, REVAK, TALERICO, FOSTER
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, TUCK
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/02/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 10
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 10
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7DP
- DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, BISHOP
- FN1: (DHS)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: SHOWER, MICCICHE, COGHILL, KAWASAKI
- FN1: (DHS)
- COSPONSOR(S): SHOWER
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, BEGICH, OLSON, BIRCH,
- WILSON, KIEHL, COGHILL, GRAY-JACKSON, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, GIESSEL
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor