+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/27/97
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/29 CHAPTER 49 SLA 97
On May 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- 10:45 AM 5/6/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
On May 1, 1997 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGAN
- PASSED Y33 N4 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 1(JUD)
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT, RYAN, JAMES
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/01 CALENDAR
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/97
On April 28, 1997 in the House:
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, KOHRING, FOSTER
- FIN RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 2NR 1AM
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COR) 1/30/97
- NR: MOSES, DAVIS; AM: DAVIES
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (DPS, LAW) 1/30/97
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (DPS, LAW) 1/30/97
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (COR) 1/30/97
- NR: CROFT, BERKOWITZ
- DP: ROKEBERG, GREEN, JAMES, BUNDE
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COWDERY
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MULDER
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1NR 2/11/97
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 1(FIN) AM
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 5 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, MACKIE, PHILLIPS
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 6DP 1DNP SAME TITLE
- DP: SHARP, PEARCE, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- TORGERSON, DONLEY; DNP: ADAMS
- PREVIOUS FN TO CS (COR)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS TO CS (DPS, LAW)
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: TAYLOR
- ZERO FISCAL NOTES TO SB & CS (LAW, DPS)
- FISCAL NOTE TO SB & CS (COR)
- DP: TAYLOR, MILLER, PARNELL, PEARCE
- JUD RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN, LEMAN
On January 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/3/97
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor