+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/12 CHAPTER 6 SLA 13
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/13/13
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1:41 PM 4/11/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 1(EFD ADD H)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, TUCK, PRUITT, MUNOZ, COSTELLO, JOHNSON, MILLETT,
- HIGGINS, LEDOUX, KAWASAKI, GRUENBERG, TARR
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SB 1(EFD ADD H)
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLMES
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, ISAACSON, GATTIS, KELLER
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, P.WILSON
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 1
- PASSED Y16 N- E3 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 1
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, STEDMAN, EGAN, BISHOP,
- DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, KELLY, HUGGINS
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor