+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): KEMPLEN
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 9(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 15, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAPSNER
- HELD TO 3/16 CALENDAR
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA
- HELD TO 3/15 CALENDAR
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/99
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
- KOTT; NR: KERTTULA
- DP: MURKOWSKI, CROFT, ROKEBERG, JAMES,
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.STA) 2/19/99
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WHITAKER
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.STA)
- WHITAKER; NR: KERTTULA; AM: OGAN
- DP: JAMES, SMALLEY, COGHILL, HUDSON,
- STA RPT 5DP 1NR 1AM
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SMALLEY
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PHILLIPS
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN, KOTT, COWDERY
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- AUSTERMAN
- COSPONSOR(S): HUDSON, MORGAN, HALCRO,
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, HARRIS, COGHILL
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor