+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 19, 2015 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/18 LEGIS RESOLVE 15
On April 18, 2015 in the House:
- 11:31 AM 4/18/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HCR 9
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STOLTZE
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
- DP: STEDMAN, ELLIS, STOLTZE
- HSS RPT 3DP
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- VERSION: HCR 9
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, JOHNSON, TARR
- PASSED Y37 E3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
- DP: TARR, STUTES, TALERICO, FOSTER, SEATON
- HSS RPT 5DP
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS