+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RES, CRA, JUD
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- PASSED Y40 N- CSHCR 9(FSH) AM
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY ULMER
- FSH CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/93
On April 8, 1993 in the House:
- DP: LARSON, PARNELL, GRUSSENDORF,HOFFMAN
- FIN RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 8DP 2NR
- DP: NAVARRE, BROWN, HANLEY, FOSTER
- NR: MARTIN, THERRIAULT
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (F&G) 3/17/93
On March 29, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JAMES
On March 26, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (F&G) 3/17/93
- NR: BUNDE, CARNEY
- DP: MULDER, WILLIAMS
- DP: HUDSON, JAMES, FINKELSTEIN, DAVIES
- RES RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 6DP 2NR
On March 17, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G) 3/17/93
- NR: PHILLIPS
- DP: MOSES, OLBERG
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 2DP 1NR
On February 22, 1993 in the House:
- FISHERIES, RESOURCES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)