+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- LINCOLN, ELTON
- DP: TORGERSON, TAYLOR, HALFORD,
- RES RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
- FN1: ZERO(H.O&G)
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N26 E5 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y31 N3 E5 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, JAMES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHCR 8(RES)
On April 6, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.O&G)
- MASEK, SCALZI; NR: CHENAULT
- DP: STEVENS, KERTTULA, MCGUIRE, FATE,
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR
On March 30, 2001 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.O&G)
- DNP: KOHRING; NR: CHENAULT
- DP: FATE, GUESS, DYSON, OGAN;
- O&G RPT CS(O&G) 4DP 1DNP 1NR
On March 16, 2001 in the House:
- O&G, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS