+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 7
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- 10:00 AM 4/9/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E4
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On March 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS HCR 7(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y18 N- A1 V1
- ELLIS, MENARD, MEYER, PASKVAN, HUGGINS, STEVENS, MCGUIRE
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2009
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT, FRENCH, WAGONER, BUNDE, THOMAS, DYSON, DAVIS,
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: MENARD, FRENCH, MEYER, PASKVAN, KOOKESH
- STA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
- STA
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- VERSION: HCR 7 AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- ENGROSSED AND SIGNED
- PASSED Y33 E1 A6
- COSPONSOR(S): ALL MEMBERS UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2009
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- DP: LYNN, KAWASAKI, OLSON, HARRIS, BUCH, GATTO
- MLV RPT 6DP
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor