+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 5/26 LEGIS RESOLVE 16
- 2:45 PM 5/19/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1993 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 N-
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y20 N- SCS HCR 7(HES)
- PEARCE, ZHAROFF
- PHILLIPS, TAYLOR, RIEGER, SHARP,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, DUNCAN,
- HES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/93
On May 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR: ELLIS
On May 7, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (H.HES)
- JUD RPT 3DP (HES)SCS
On April 28, 1993 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DONLEY
On March 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- HES RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN APPLIES TO SCS(H.HES)
On March 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LITTLE
On March 15, 1993 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, LEMAN, JACKO
- HES, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 12, 1993 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/93
- PASSED Y36 N- E3 A1 HCR 7
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 10, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.HES/NONE)
- DP: B.DAVIS, NICHOLIA, BRICE, OLBERG
- DP: KOTT, VEZEY, G.DAVIS, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- HES RPT 9DP
On February 22, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS, SITTON
On February 19, 1993 in the House:
- HEALTH, EDUCATION & SOCIAL SERVICES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor