+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 75
On May 29, 1998 in the House:
- 9:55 AM 5/29/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- PEARCE, MILLER, WARD
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 62(CRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- HELD TO 5/10 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/98
On May 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 2DP 1NR
- (H) ZERO FN (CRA)
- DP: GREEN, MILLER; NR: DUNCAN
On April 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR: GREEN
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 23, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/98
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N25 E2 A5
- KEMPLEN, ROKEBERG
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 62
- PASSED Y33 E2 A5
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING, PORTER,
- GRUSSENDORF, KELLY, MULDER, FOSTER,
- HODGINS, DAVIS, DAVIES, DYSON, RYAN,
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.CRA)
- RYAN, KOOKESH
- DP: JOULE, OGAN, SANDERS, IVAN, DYSON,
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) 7DP
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- C&RA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor