+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/5 HOUSE RESOLVE 6
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- 4:41 PM 2/21/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- GUTTENBERG, CLAMAN, LEDOUX, MILLETT
- GARA, GRENN, DRUMMOND, JOHNSON, TALERICO, LINCOLN, SADDLER, KAWASAKI,
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO, TUCK, STUTES, ORTIZ, SEATON, BIRCH, JOHNSTON, CHENAULT,
- VERSION: HR 6 AM
- PASSED Y33 N5 E1 V1
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y30 N8 E1 V1
- PRIME SPONSOR: EDGMON
- FN1: ZERO(H.RLS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- HELD TO 2/21 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2018
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor