+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/13 HOUSE RESOLVE 6
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- 11:15 A.M. 5/31/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR, JACKSON, ZULKOSKY, SPOHNHOLZ, EASTMAN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON
- VERSION: HR 6
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, VANCE
- HELD TO 5/6 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- MLV RPT 5DP
- DP: KOPP, THOMPSON, TUCK, TARR, LEDOUX
- FN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.TRB)
- DP: VANCE, ORTIZ, EDGMON, TALERICO, KOPP, LINCOLN, ZULKOSKY
- TRB RPT 7DP
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, HOPKINS
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REVAK
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- TRB, MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor