+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 5/09 LEGIS RESOLVE 58
On May 6, 1996 in the House:
- 11:35 PM 5/06/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 30, 1996 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N1 A3
On April 28, 1996 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 59(RES)
- PASSED Y19 N1
- CROSS SPONSOR: LEMAN
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 4/26 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y12 N8
- CROSS SPONSORS: SALO, TORGERSON
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/96
On March 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (H.RES/LEG)
- RES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 14, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y32 N3 E2 A3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 59(RES)
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCE TO 3RD RDG FLD Y27 N11 E1 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/14 CALENDAR
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.RES/LEG)
- DP: GREEN
- DP: LONG, OGAN, KOTT, AUSTERMAN, BARNES
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)