+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- SIGNED BY GOVERNOR 5/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 51
- 11:45 AM 5/18/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1994 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N3 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y13 N7
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 56(RES)
On May 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- ADVANCE TO THIRD READING FLD Y11 N9
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/94
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN APPLIES (DCED)
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/7/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 56(RES)
- PASSED Y32 N4 E2 A2
- NORDLUND NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 3/2/94
- NR: DAVIES
- DP: BUNDE, HUDSON
- DP: CARNEY, GREEN, JAMES, MULDER
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF HOUSE ECONOMIC TASK FORCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor