+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW) 2/21/96
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/21/96
- NR: VEZEY, FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS
- DNP: TOOHEY
- DP: PORTER, GREEN, BUNDE
- JUD RPT CS(FSH) 3DP 1DNP 3NR
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) 3DP 2NR
- DP: OGAN, G.DAVIS, AUSTERMAN
- NR: ELTON, MOSES
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/21/96
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW) 2/21/96
On February 21, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
- FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- AM: PORTER
- NR: JAMES, IVAN, ROBINSON, WILLIS
- DP: GREEN, OGAN
- STA RPT 2DP 4NR 1AM
On January 8, 1996 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, FSH, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On December 29, 1995 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor