+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 17
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- 3:30 PM 4/9/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E5 A2
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS HCR 5(STA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/01
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: THERRIAULT, PHILLIPS;
- NR: PEARCE, DAVIS
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 14, 2001 in the House:
- VERSION: HCR 5(TITLE AM)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y34 E3 A3
- AM NO 1 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/01
On February 12, 2001 in the House:
- RLS FOR CALENDARING
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor