+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On March 12, 1993 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 3/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 4
On March 10, 1993 in the House:
- 5:20 PM 3/9/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- JACKO, LINCOLN, PHILLIPS
- FRANK, KELLY, PEARCE, LITTLE, ELLIS
- TAYLOR, MILLER, RIEGER, SHARP,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DUNCAN, KERTTULA,
- READ THE SECOND TIME HCR 5
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1DP 3/5/93
On February 24, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS HOUSE ZERO FN (LAA)
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
On February 19, 1993 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 17, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): NAVARRE, MENARD
- PASSED Y38 N- E2
- READ THE SECOND TIME HCR 5
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/17/93
On February 10, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 2/10/93
- STA RPT 4DP 3NR
On January 22, 1993 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor