+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/6 HOUSE RESOLVE 5
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- 4:40 P.M. 4/5/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- MEMBERS: VANCE ADDED; ORTIZ REPLACED KREISS-TOMKINS
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y38 E2
- PASSED Y37 N1 E2
- VERSION: HR 5 AM
- ZULKOSKY (CHAIR), EDGMON (VICE CHAIR), LINCOLN, KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, TALERICO
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor