+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 24, 2006 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/18 LEGIS RESOLVE 51
On July 11, 2006 in the House:
- 1:54 PM 7/11/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HCR 48 AM S
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y20 N-
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE FIRST TIME
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: HCR 48 AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 A2
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS
- READ THE FIRST TIME
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST
Type:
Primary Sponsor