+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 10, 2006 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/21 LEGIS RESOLVE 56
- 3:25 PM 6/19/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HCR 46
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
On May 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK
On May 7, 2006 in the House:
- VERSION: HCR 46
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y31 A9
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 6, 2006 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/6 - ON 5/7 CALENDAR
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/5 - ON 5/6 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2006
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor