+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On September 28, 2007 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 9/5 LEGIS RESOLVE 13
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- 5:09 PM 6/1/07 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 11, 2007 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N6 E2
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2007
- RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHJR 4(RES)
- PASSED Y14 N6
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHJR 4(RES)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS
- DP: HUGGINS, WAGONER, MCGUIRE, GREEN
- RES RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE, THERRIAULT, MCGUIRE, WILKEN, HUGGINS
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 4(RLS)
- PASSED Y22 N11 E5 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 4(RLS)
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2007
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- NR: HARRIS, GUTTENBERG
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, SAMUELS, JOHNSON, COGHILL
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 4DP 2NR
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2007
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- DNP: GUTTENBERG
- DP: ROSES, SEATON, KOHRING, GATTO, JOHNSON
- RES RPT CS(FSH) NT 5DP 1DNP
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.FSH)
- NR: LEDOUX
- DP: JOHNSON, EDGMON, SEATON
- FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 3DP 1NR
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- FSH, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS