+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN2: (LEG)
- FN1: (GOV)
- NR: LYNN, HERRON
- DNP: GATTO
- DP: GRUENBERG, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT CS(STA) NT 2DP 1DNP 2NR
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON, PETERSEN
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
- FN2: (LEG)
- DNP: GATTO
- NR: LYNN
- FN1: (GOV)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, THOMAS
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOULE, SALMON, KERTTULA, AUSTERMAN, EDGMON
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor