+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- ENGROSSED
- FAILED PASSAGE Y22 N18
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y15 23 A2
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 35
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, JOHNSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- DNP: DOOGAN, N.FOSTER
- FIN RPT 3DP 2DNP 3NR 2AM
- DP: THOMAS, KELLY, STOLTZE
- NR: JOULE, AUSTERMAN, HAWKER
- FN1: (GOV)
- AM: GARA, FAIRCLOUGH
On March 12, 2010 in the House:
- FN1: (GOV)
- NR: HERRON, DAHLSTROM
- DNP: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
- DP: LYNN, GATTO, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT 3DP 2DNP 2NR
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- DP: T.WILSON, LYNN, KELLER
- HSS RPT 3DP 1NR
- COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE, LYNN
- NR: HERRON
- FN1: (GOV)
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- HSS, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/10
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor