+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On April 18, 2009 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 33(RES) AM
- PASSED Y38 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHJR 33(RES) AM
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- NR: GUTTENBERG, TUCK
- DP: OLSON, EDGMON, SEATON, P.WILSON, NEUMAN, JOHNSON
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP 2NR
On April 13, 2009 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor