+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 25, 1995 in the House:
- RESCIND ACTION IN FLG TO PASS/WITHDRAWN
- FAILED PASSAGE Y20 N19 E1
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 2 FLD Y14 N25 E1
- TABLE HJR 33 FLD Y14 N25 E1
- TABLE TWO WEEKS Y14 N25 E1
- MOTION TO TABLE
- RESCIND ACTION/FLG/RETURN FLD Y20 N19 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 1 FLD Y19 N20 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 18, 1995 in the House:
- HOLD RECON TO 4/25/95 PASSED Y24 N11 E5
On April 13, 1995 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 33
- POSTPONE/2 WEEKS Y11 N21 E7 A1
- FAILED PASSAGE Y19 N13 E7 A1
- MASEK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): OGAN
- REFERRED TO RULES
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (F&G)
- NR: PORTER
- DNP: FINKELSTEIN, B.DAVIS
- DP: TOOHEY, GREEN, BUNDE
- JUD RPT 3DP 2DNP 1NR
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): BUNDE
On March 1, 1995 in the House:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)