+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 24, 2008 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 70
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- 11:36 AM 5/23/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHJR 31(RES)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y16 N3 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, BUNDE, DYSON, WILKEN, GREEN, HUGGINS, STEDMAN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2008
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 31(RES)
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, MCGUIRE
- DP: HUGGINS, WAGONER, GREEN
- RES RPT 3DP 3NR
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT
- RES
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHJR 31(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y30 N6 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHJR 31(RES)
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR
- RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2008
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.RES)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: GUTTENBERG
- DP: ROSES, WILSON, FAIRCLOUGH, EDGMON, GATTO, JOHNSON
- RES RPT CS(RES) 6DP 1NR 1AM
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor