+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 15, 2006 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/30 LEGIS RESOLVE 54
On July 11, 2006 in the House:
- 1:54 PM 7/11/06 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 9, 2006 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 A4
On May 4, 2006 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS HJR 31(HES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y19 N1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HJR 31(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- COWDERY
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, DYSON, DAVIS, KOOKESH, ELLIS, STEVENS G, GUESS,
- HES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2006
On March 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- HES RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
- DP: DYSON, ELTON, OLSON, WILKEN, GREEN
- FN1: ZERO(H.HES)
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 31
- PASSED Y31 E5 A4
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HJR 31
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.HES)
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, KOHRING, WILSON
- HES RPT 4DP
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor