+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 5/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 48
- 10:30 AM 5/17/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 1994 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N- A3
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED BY UNANIMOUS CONSENT HCR 31 AM S
- DONLEY, KELLY, RIEGER, SALO
- KERTTULA, ELLIS, ZHAROFF, LITTLE, PEARCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, DUNCAN,
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/94
On March 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DHSS)
- HES RPT 6DP
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- HEALTH, EDUCATION & SOCIAL SERVICES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
- PASSED Y36 N- E3 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/94
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 2/15/94
- DP: TOOHEY, OLBERG, NICHOLIA
- DP: KOTT, VEZEY, G.DAVIS, BUNDE
- HES RPT 7DP
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): PORTER
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SANDERS
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- HEALTH, EDUCATION & SOCIAL SERVICES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor