+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN2: (GOV)
- FN1: ZERO(H.STA)
- NR: GRUENBERG
- DP: LYNN, COGHILL, DAHLSTROM, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.STA)
- NR: GRUENBERG
- DP: GATTO, SEATON, P.WILSON, PETERSEN, JOHNSON, LYNN
- STA RPT 6DP 1NR
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SEATON
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- STA, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09