+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 30
- 1:40 PM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 29
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 29
- WAGONER, DAVIS, TAYLOR, STEVENS B
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELLIS, FRENCH,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2003
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- BUNDE, GUESS
- STEVENS G, LINCOLN, OLSON, WILKEN,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, DYSON,
- HES REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: HJR 29
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- PASSED Y36 E4
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 29
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(H.MLV)
- CISSNA, FATE, GRUENBERG, LYNN
- DP: DAHLSTROM, WEYHRAUCH, MASEK,
- MLV RPT 7DP
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor