+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 2, 1994 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 41
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- 4:05 PM 4/27/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- ZHAROFF NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y13 N6 E1 HCR 29 AM
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS RPT 2CAL 2NR 4/21/94
On April 5, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (H.STA)
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (H.STA)
- STA RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY, LEMAN,
- TAYLOR, MILLER, SHARP
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
- PASSED Y32 N4 E3 A1 HCR 29 AM
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y19 N17 E3 A1
- AM NO 1 BY DAVIES
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/17/94
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.STA) 2/11/94
- DP: OLBERG, B.DAVIS, ULMER
- DP: VEZEY, KOTT, SANDERS, G.DAVIS
- STA RPT 7DP
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)