+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 27, 1994 in the House:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 4/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 38
On April 25, 1994 in the House:
- 11:15 AM 4/25/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N- E1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 19, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 CSHCR 25(L&C) AM S
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LITTLE, TAYLOR
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/94
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (DEC)
- STA RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/17/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 N- E3 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): BROWN, NAVARRE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DEC) 1/31/94
- DP: OLBERG, B.DAVIS, G.DAVIS
- DP: VEZEY, KOTT, SANDERS, ULMER
- STA RPT CS(L&C) 7DP
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 6DP
- DP: WILLIAMS, GREEN
- DP: HUDSON, PORTER, SITTON, MACKIE
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DEC) 1/31/94
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B. DAVIS
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NORDLUND
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
On January 14, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On January 10, 1994 in the House:
- LABOR & COMMERCE, STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor