+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- FILED PERMANENTLY 5/29 LEGIS RESOLVE 65
- 9:15 AM 5/13/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME HCR 25 AM
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/96
On May 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (GOV)
- STA RPT 5DP
On April 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 18, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On February 28, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV) 2/15/96
- NR: GREEN
- DP: JAMES, PORTER, ROBINSON, WILLIS
- STA RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (GOV)
- NR: DAVIES
- DP: FOSTER, IVAN, KOTT, WILLIS, MULDER
- MLV RPT 5DP 1NR
On February 5, 1996 in the House:
- MLV, STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
SP CMTE MILITARY & VETERANS AFFAIRS
Type:
Primary Sponsor