+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 20
On May 23, 2005 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:45 PM 5/23/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HJR 20
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- STEVENS B
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, STEDMAN, OLSON, COWDERY, ELLIS, SEEKINS, WAGONER,
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 20
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2005
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: DYSON, ELTON, WILKEN, OLSON
- HES RPT 4DP
On May 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- VERSION: HJR 20
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, DAHLSTROM, KERTTULA, MCGUIRE
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 20
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2005
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: CISSNA, GARDNER, ANDERSON, WILSON
- HES RPT 4DP
On April 21, 2005 in the House:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor