+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/27 HOUSE RESOLVE 2
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- 12:15 P.M. 3/5/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- MEMBERS: TUCK REPLACED STORY
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- MEMBERS: STORY, CLAMAN, ZULKOSKY, FIELDS, RAUSCHER, KAUFMAN
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/18/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y39 A1
- VERSION: HR 2
- MEMBERS: SCHRAGE (CHAIR)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor