+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- 1:20 PM 6/3/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- READ BY GOVERNOR 6/24 LEGIS RESOLVE 18
On May 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N- HCR 19
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAA)
- RULES 3CAL 1NR 5/11/93
On May 9, 1993 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 27, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAA)
- O&G RPT 2DP 1NR
On April 26, 1993 in the Senate:
- O&G, JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 24, 1993 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N- A2
On April 23, 1993 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MENARD
- NAVARRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y37 N3 HCR 19
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/93
On April 22, 1993 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 4/22/93
- DP: KOTT, GREEN, OLBERG, G.DAVIS,SANDERS
- O&G RPT 5DP
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- OIL AND GAS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)